ND SB2069 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 92
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 92
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 44-04-18.27 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to applications for public employment.
Title
Applications for public employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 1 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 92 |
2021-03-12 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2021-03-12 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 7 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 3 0 |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |