ND 2063 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota university system; to amend and reenact sections 15-18.2-05, 15-18.2-06, 15-62.2-02, and 54-44.1-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to state aid to institutions, minimum amount payable, and the cancellation of unexpended appropriations; to provide for transfer of funds; to authorize projects for North Dakota state university and the university of North Dakota; to authorize the state board of higher education to issue and sell bonds for capital projects; to provide exemptions; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State aid to institutions, minimum amount payable, and the cancellation of unexpended appropriations; to provide for transfer of funds; to authorize projects for North Dakota state university and the university of North Dakota; to authorize the state board of higher education to issue and sell bonds for capital projects; to provide exemptions; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-27 - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-27SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
2017-01-26SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on consent calendar 14 0 0
2017-01-18SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-18SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-01-17SenateCommittee Hearing 02:15
2017-01-17SenateCommittee Hearing 01:30
2017-01-17SenateCommittee Hearing 10:45
2017-01-17SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-17SenateCommittee Hearing 09:15
2017-01-17SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-01-16SenateCommittee Hearing 03:45
2017-01-16SenateCommittee Hearing 03:00
2017-01-16SenateCommittee Hearing 02:15
2017-01-16SenateCommittee Hearing 01:30
2017-01-16SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-01-16SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback