ND SB2062 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 12-60-24 and section 55-01-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal history record checks by the state historical society for volunteers and final applicants for employment.
Title
Criminal history record checks by the state historical society for volunteers and final applicants for employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/23 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 12 |
2021-03-12 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 1 |
2021-03-12 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 3 |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |