ND SB2059 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 43-17-02.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to licensure exemption for certain physicians.
Title
Licensure exemption for certain physicians.
Sponsors
Sen. David Clemens [R] | Sen. Dave Oehlke [R] | Sen. Ray Holmberg [R] | Rep. Charles Damschen [R] |
Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Gary Paur [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/21 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |