ND SB2059 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 15.1-02-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the North Dakota teacher of the year award.
Title
The North Dakota teacher of the year award.
Sponsors
Sen. Kyle Davison [R] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] | Sen. David Rust [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] |
Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] | Rep. Glenn Bosch [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 5 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-13 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 41 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |