ND SB2058 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor 04/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor 04/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 6 of section 54-17.8-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the North Dakota outdoor heritage advisory board.
Title
The North Dakota outdoor heritage advisory board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/15 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 4 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 85 nays 6 |
2019-04-04 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 6 3 |
2019-04-01 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-04-01 | House | Amendment adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1 |
2019-03-25 | House | Rereferred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |