ND 2058 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 57-39.2-23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the disclosure of confidential tax information to the unclaimed property division; and to amend and reenact subsection

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contracting for in-state unclaimed property examinations and the disclosure of confidential tax information to the unclaimed property division.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-15SenateSigned by Governor 03/14
2013-03-13SenateSent to Governor
2013-03-12SenateSigned by President
2013-03-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-03-08SenateReturned to Senate
2013-03-07HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0
2013-03-06HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2
2013-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 09:15
2013-02-15HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2013-01-17HouseReceived from Senate
2013-01-16SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1
2013-01-15SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2013-01-14SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2013-01-10SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2013-01-08SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback