ND 2054 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to higher education tuition and fees waivers for law enforcement officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher education tuition and fees waivers for law enforcement officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 14 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-03HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 76
2017-03-31HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 17 2 2
2017-03-14HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-01-23SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 1
2017-01-20SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-19SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1
2017-01-10SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback