ND 2046 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact sections 54-52-02.15, 54-52-02.16, and 54-52.6-02.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the public employees retirement system main system and membership in the public employees retirement system defined contribution plan; to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 54-52-01, sections 54-52-02.5 and 54-52-02.9, subsection 2 of section 54-52-05, subsection 1 of section 54-52-06, and sections 54-52.6-01, 54-52.6-02, and 54-52.6-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the public employees retirement system retirement plans; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide an appropriation; to provide for a transfer; to provide for application; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The public employees retirement system retirement plans; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide an appropriation; to provide for a transfer; to provide for application; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 35
2021-04-29SenateConference committee report adopted
2021-04-29SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-29SenateAppoint Sen. Wobbema to replace Sen. K. Roers on conference committee
2021-04-27SenateAppoint Sen. Weber to replace Sen. Meyer on conference committee
2021-04-26HouseConference committee appointed Kasper Louser Steiner
2021-04-23SenateConference committee appointed K. Roers Meyer Vedaa
2021-04-23SenateRefused to concur
2021-04-23SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2021-04-23HouseEmergency clause carried
2021-04-23HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 76 nays 16
2021-04-23HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-04-22HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1
2021-03-19HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-03-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-02-22HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-19SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-02-19SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-18SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
2021-02-11SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-02-04SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2021-02-04SenateReported back, do pass 7 0 0
2021-01-14SenateCommittee Hearing 01:00
2021-01-05SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback