ND 2046 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Committee Hearing 08:30
Pending: Joint Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
Hearing: Mar 2 @ 8:30 am in Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 27-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the establishment of a pilot program for providing state services to juveniles adjudicated in tribal court; to provide for a report to legislative management; and to provide an expiration date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The establishment of a pilot program for providing state services to juveniles adjudicated in tribal court; to provide for a report to legislative management; and to provide an expiration date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-17 - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-02HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-02-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-02-02HouseReceived from Senate
2017-01-17SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-01-13SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1
2017-01-12SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback