ND SB2045 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-52.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to payment of administrative expenses for the public employees retirement system deferred compensation plan; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Title
Payment of administrative expenses for the public employees retirement system deferred compensation plan; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 7 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 87 |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |