ND SB2043 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 12.1-23-09, subsection 6 of section 13-04.1-09.2, sections 14-03-01, 14-03-08, 14-05-06, 14-05-18, 14-07-01, 14-07-03, 14-07-04, 14-07-06, 14-07-07, 14-07-08, 14-07-12, 14-07-13, and 14-07-14, subsection 9 of section 14-12.2-28, subsection 4 of section 14-14.1-30, sections 14-15-03, 14-15-20, 14-18-08, and 20.1-03-06, subsections 8, 29, and 32 of section 20.1-03-12, subdivision b of subsection 1 of section 30.1-10-04, sections 35-01-04, 47-18-04, 47-18-05, 47-18-14, and 50-25.1-10, subsection 3 of section 54-52.4-02, subsection 2 of section 57-38-31, subsection 5 of section 57-40.3-04, section 57-40.3-07, and subsection 3 of section 57-40.5-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of marriage and the recognition of marital relationships.
Title
The definition of marriage and the recognition of marital relationships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 31 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |