ND SB2042 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of developing a uniform county system of accounting.
Title
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of developing a uniform county system of accounting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/30 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 37 nays 9 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-04-26 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2019-04-23 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-04-22 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-04-19 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-04-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |