ND 2042 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 21 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 5-01-05.1, 12.1-01-04, 12.1-04-06, 12.1-04.1-02, 12.1-04.1-03, 12.1-04.1-04, 12.1-04.1-05, 12.1-04.1-06, 12.1-04.1-07, 12.1-04.1-08, 12.1-04.1-10, 12.1-04.1-11, 12.1-04.1-12, 12.1-04.1-13, 12.1-04.1-14, 12.1-04.1-15, 12.1-04.1-22, 12.1-04.1-23, 25-01-01, 25-03.1-04, 25-03.1-08, 25-03.1-10, 25-03.1-11, 25-03.1-18.1, 32-03-48, and 43-41-07, subdivision b of subsection 1 of section 43-48-15, sections 49-10.1-05, 50-25.1-03, 50-25.2-03, and 62.1-01-01, subdivisions b and c of subsection 1 of section 62.1-02-01, and subdivision b of subsection 1 of section 62.1-02-01.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to references to mental health professionals and licensure of social workers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

References to mental health professionals and licensure of social workers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-21SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-21SenateSigned by President
2017-04-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-20HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 88 nays 3
2017-04-20HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-20HouseReported back from conference committee, further amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-19SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 0
2017-04-19SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-19SenateReported back from conference committee, further amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-07HouseConference committee appointed Porter Westlind P. Anderson
2017-04-04SenateConference committee appointed J. Lee Anderson Heckaman
2017-04-04SenateRefused to concur
2017-04-03SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-31HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 86 nays 4
2017-03-31HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-30HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1
2017-02-13HouseCommittee Hearing 03:15
2017-02-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2017-02-02HouseReceived from Senate
2017-01-30SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-01-27SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-26SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-01-11SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba2042.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0228-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0228-03001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0228-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0228-04002a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0228-05000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0228-06000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0228-07000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-18.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-59.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-71.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-72.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback