ND 2040 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 40
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 6-09.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to bonded debt repayments; to amend and reenact sections 6-09.4-06, 6-09.4-10, and 15.1-36-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to borrowing and lending authority of the public finance authority, reserve funds associated with bonds, and the school construction assistance revolving loan fund; to provide an appropriation; and to provide a bond issue limit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Borrowing and lending authority of the public finance authority, reserve funds associated with bonds, and the school construction assistance revolving loan fund; to provide an appropriation; and to provide a bond issue limit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 7 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 40
2021-02-17SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 2 0
2021-01-28SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-01-05SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback