ND SB2040 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 43-45-01 and section 43-45-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the scope of practice of addiction counselors.
Title
The scope of practice of addiction counselors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 1 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-20 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 43 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |