ND SB2040 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 25-03.1-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to evaluations in involuntary mental health commitments.
Title
Evaluations in involuntary mental health commitments.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25 | |
2011-04-25 | Signed by Governor 04/25 | |
2011-04-22 | Signed by President | |
2011-03-11 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-10 | Returned to Senate | |
2011-03-09 | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 2 | |
2011-03-08 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-03-02 | Committee Hearing 02:30 | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee | |
2011-01-21 | Received from Senate | |
2011-01-20 | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 | |
2011-01-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-01-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 0 | |
2011-01-12 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |