ND 2038 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the establishment of a task force on children's behavioral health; to amend and reenact section 15.1-07-34, subsection 1 of section 25-03.1-11, and section 25-03.1-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to emergency hold limitations for mental health examinations; to provide for a report to the governor and the legislative management; and to repeal sections 15.1-19-19 and 15.1-19-24 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to professional development training regarding the prevention of bullying and youth suicide.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional development training regarding the prevention of bullying and youth suicide.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 54 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 54 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10SenateSigned by Governor 04/07
2017-04-05SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-04SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-04-04SenateConcurred
2017-03-31SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-30HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 68 nays 23
2017-03-30HouseDivision B passed
2017-03-30HouseDivision A passed
2017-03-30HouseDivision of bill
2017-03-29HouseLaid over one legislative day
2017-03-27HouseLaid over one legislative day
2017-03-23HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-22HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 09:15
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2017-02-17HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-02SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-02-01SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 4 0
2017-01-31SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-23SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2017-01-20SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-19SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-01-04SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback