ND 2037 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 15-10-37 and 15-10-38 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the technology occupations student loan and teacher shortage loan forgiveness programs; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to provide for reports to the legislative management.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The technology occupations student loan and teacher shortage loan forgiveness programs; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to provide for reports to the legislative management.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 67 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25SenateSigned by Governor 04/24
2017-04-24SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-24SenateSigned by President
2017-04-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-21HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 67 nays 25
2017-04-21HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-20HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-20SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-04-20SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-19SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-17SenateAppoint Sen. Schaible to replace Sen. Davison on conference committee
2017-04-17HouseConference committee report rejected
2017-04-17HouseRequest return from committee
2017-04-14HouseRereferred to conference committee
2017-04-13HouseLaid over two legislative days
2017-04-12HouseReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede)
2017-04-12SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-04-12SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-10SenateReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede)
2017-04-06HouseConference committee appointed Schreiber-Beck Pyle Guggisberg
2017-04-04SenateConference committee appointed Rust Vedaa Davison
2017-04-04SenateRefused to concur
2017-03-31SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-30HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 82 nays 8
2017-03-30HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-29HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 3 1
2017-03-15HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2017-03-15HouseReported back, do pass 12 0 2
2017-03-10HouseRereferred to Education
2017-03-08HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2017-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-02SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1
2017-02-01SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-31SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1
2017-01-30SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-19SenateRereferred to Education
2017-01-19SenateRequest return from committee
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba2037.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0191-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0191-02001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0191-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0191-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0191-05000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0191-06000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-21.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-58.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-66.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-72.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-73.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback