ND SB2036 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Taxation Committee) AN ACT to create and enact section 57-20-07.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to taxing district budgets and state-paid property tax relief credits; to amend and reenact sections 57-12-09, 57-15-02.1, 57-20-07.1, 57-20-09, and 57-20-21.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to notices of property assessment increases, hearings on proposed property tax increases, contents of property tax statements, discounts for early payment of property taxes, and application of relief to current taxes; to provide an appropriation; to provide for legislative management studies; to provide an effective date; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
Notices of property assessment increases, hearings on proposed property tax increases, contents of property tax statements, discounts for early payment of property taxes, and application of relief to current taxes; to provide an appropriation; to provide for legislative management studies; to provide an effective date; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor 05/06 |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-05-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-05-03 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2013-05-03 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-03 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 39 nays 2 |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-05-03 | House | Conference committee appointed Belter Headland S. Kelsh |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Cook Oehlke Dotzenrod |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2013-04-18 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 3 |
2013-04-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-17 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1 |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-26 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 0 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |