ND 2035 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 15-18.2-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the minimum amount payable through the higher education funding formula; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The minimum amount payable through the higher education funding formula; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 1 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 88
2017-04-27HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 17 1 3
2017-03-13HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-13SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
2017-02-10SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 1
2017-01-23SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback