ND 2035 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

(Energy Development and Transmission Committee) AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-39.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a sales tax exemption for tangible personal property used to construct a fertilizer or chemical processing facility; to amend and reenact section 40-57.1-03 and subsection 4 of section 57-40.2-03.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to requirements of a city or county granting a property tax exemption and a use tax exemption for tangible personal property used to construct a fertilizer or chemical processing facility; to provide for studies by the legislative management and industrial commission; and to provide for a retroactive effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requirements of a city or county granting a property tax exemption and a use tax exemption for tangible personal property used to construct a fertilizer or chemical processing facility; to provide for studies by the legislative management and industrial commission; and to provide for a retroactive effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-22SenateSigned by Governor 04/22
2015-04-21SenateSent to Governor
2015-04-21SenateSigned by President
2015-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-04-17HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 81 nays 10
2015-04-17HouseConference committee report adopted
2015-04-16HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2015-04-16SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2015-04-16SenateConference committee report adopted
2015-04-16SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2015-04-02HouseConference committee appointed Headland Owens Haak
2015-04-01SenateConference committee appointed Laffen Unruh Dotzenrod
2015-04-01SenateRefused to concur
2015-03-30SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2015-03-27HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 78 nays 11
2015-03-27HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2015-03-26HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
2015-03-09HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2015-03-04HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2015-03-04HouseReceived from Senate
2015-02-25SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2015-02-25SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2015-02-24SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2015-01-19SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2015-01-06SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/bill-actions/ba2035.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-0240-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-0240-02004a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-0240-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-0240-03002a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-0240-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-0240-05000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-0240-06000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/journals/sr-dailyjnl-37.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/journals/hr-dailyjnl-56.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/journals/sr-dailyjnl-69.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/journals/hr-dailyjnl-70.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback