ND 2034 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Pending: Joint Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 62.1-02-01 and a new subsection to section 62.1-02-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the possession of firearms; to amend and reenact subsections 3 and 7 of section 62.1-01-01, subsection 1 of section 62.1-02-01.1, subsection 1 of section 62.1-02-05, subdivision l of subsection 2 of section 62.1-02-05, section 62.1-02-07, subdivision a of subsection 6 of section 62.1-02-13, and sections 62.1-03-01 and 62.1-04-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the possession of firearms; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The possession of firearms; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2019-01-15HouseReceived from Senate
2019-01-14SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
2019-01-11SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-01-10SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-01-09SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2019-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback