ND 2033 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 34
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

(Initiated and Referred Measures Study Commission) A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 16.1-01-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to legislative council drafting services for initiated measures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative council drafting services for initiated measures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 13 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-19SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 34
2019-04-19SenateConference committee report adopted
2019-04-18SenateReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede)
2019-04-09HouseConference committee appointed C. Johnson Karls P. Anderson
2019-04-02SenateConference committee appointed Davison Vedaa Oban
2019-04-02SenateRefused to concur
2019-03-06SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2019-03-05HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 83 nays 5
2019-03-04HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-01HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2019-02-28HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2019-01-15HouseReceived from Senate
2019-01-14SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 4
2019-01-11SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2019-01-10SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2019-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback