ND SB2033 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 43-41-04, sections 43-41-07 and 43-47-06, and subsection 7 of section 43-53-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to licensure requirements for behavioral health professionals; and to provide for a report to the legislative management.
Title
Licensure requirements for behavioral health professionals; and to provide for a report to the legislative management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/17 |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-12 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 87 nays 0 |
2017-04-12 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-10 | House | Reported back from conference committee, further amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, further amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-05 | House | Conference committee appointed Rohr Kiefert Schneider |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Anderson J. Lee Piepkorn |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-27 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2017-03-23 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Human Services |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |