ND 2030 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor, but item veto 05/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide an appropriation to the state board of higher education for the higher education challenge matching grant program; to create and enact paragraph 3 of subdivision b of subsection 1 of section 15-10-48 and paragraph 3 of subdivision b of subsection 1 of section 15-10-49 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to institution eligibility for a matching grant for the advancement of academics; to amend and reenact subdivision c of subsection 1 of section 15-10-48 and section 15-18.2-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to matching grants for the advancement of academics and state aid for institutions of higher education; to repeal subdivision d of subsection 1 of section 15-10-48 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the eligibility of the university of North Dakota school of medicine and health sciences to receive a matching grant for the advancement of academics; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The eligibility of the university of North Dakota school of medicine and health sciences to receive a matching grant for the advancement of academics; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 66 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 24 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 24 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20SenateSigned by Governor, but item veto 05/07
2021-04-27SenateSent to Governor
2021-04-27SenateSigned by President
2021-04-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-27HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-26HouseReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede)
2021-04-26SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 35 nays 11
2021-04-26SenateConference committee report adopted
2021-04-26SenateReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede)
2021-04-19HouseConference committee appointed Schatz Monson Schmidt
2021-04-15SenateConference committee appointed Krebsbach Wanzek Heckaman
2021-04-15SenateRefused to concur
2021-04-07SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2021-04-07HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 66 nays 25
2021-04-06HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-04-05HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 7 1
2021-03-15HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-03-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
2021-02-19HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-18SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 29 nays 18
2021-02-18SenateReconsidered
2021-02-18SenateLaid over one legislative day
2021-02-18SenateAmendment adopted
2021-02-18SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2021-02-18SenateAmendment adopted
2021-02-18SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2021-02-18SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-17SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2021-01-21SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-01-05SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback