ND 2029 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
Pending: Joint Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapters 4.1-18, 4.1-20, 4.1-21, 4.1-22, and 4.1-48 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to revisions of agriculture laws regarding industrial hemp, soil conservation districts laws, forestry and tree distribution, nurseries, and potato production contracts; to amend and reenact section 57-38-34.6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to optional contributions to the trees for North Dakota program trust; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Optional contributions to the trees for North Dakota program trust; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-18 - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
2017-02-02HouseReceived from Senate
2017-01-18SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-01-17SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-16SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-01-05SenateCommittee Hearing 01:00
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback