ND SB2028 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapters 4.1-25, 4.1-27, 4.1-28, 4.1-30, 4.1-31, 4.1-32, 4.1-41, and 4.1-53 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to revisions of agriculture laws regarding dairy products regulation, livestock auction markets, satellite video livestock auction markets, the purchase of livestock by packing plants, meat inspection, rendering plants, commercial feed laws, and livestock medicine; to amend and reenact sections 23-01-25, 36-21-01, 36-21-10, 36-21-11, 36-21-12, 36-21-13, 36-21-15, 36-21-18, and 36-21-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to general livestock provisions; to repeal chapters 19-13.1, 19-14, 36-05, 36-05.1, 36-06, 36-07, section 36-21-05, and chapter 36-24 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to commercial feed laws, livestock medicine, livestock auction markets, satellite video livestock auction markets, the purchase of livestock by packing plants, rendering plants, general livestock provisions, and meat inspection; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Commercial feed laws, livestock medicine, livestock auction markets, satellite video livestock auction markets, the purchase of livestock by packing plants, rendering plants, general livestock provisions, and meat inspection; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/05 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-28 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2017-03-21 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-20 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-03-17 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |