ND 2026 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide for a department of transportation long combination vehicle study and pilot projects; and to provide for a legislative management report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide for a department of transportation long combination vehicle study and pilot projects; and to provide for a legislative management report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateSigned by Governor 04/23
2021-04-22SenateSent to Governor
2021-04-22SenateSigned by President
2021-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-16HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 70 nays 22
2021-04-16HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-16HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-16SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 39 nays 6
2021-04-16SenateConference committee report adopted
2021-04-15SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-14SenateConference committee report rejected
2021-04-14SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-12HouseConference committee appointed Kading Hagert Hanson
2021-04-07SenateConference committee appointed Conley Clemens Bakke
2021-04-07SenateRefused to concur
2021-04-01SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2021-03-31HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 66 nays 27
2021-03-26HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-25HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 2 3
2021-03-24HouseRereferred to Transportation
2021-03-22HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-19HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0
2021-03-04HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2021-01-25HouseReceived from Senate
2021-01-22SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 30 nays 17
2021-01-21SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
2021-01-07SenateCommittee Hearing 01:00
2021-01-05SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/bill-actions/ba2026.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0175-01000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0175-01006a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0175-02000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0175-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0175-01008a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0175-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0175-05000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-12.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-56.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-67.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-67.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback