ND SB2026 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapters 4.1-01, 4.1-15, 4.1-19, 4.1-54, 4.1-55, 11-38, 11-39, and 15-12.1, a new section to chapter 19-02.1, and chapter 54-60.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to revisions of agriculture laws regarding the agriculture commissioner, the northern crops institute, eggs, miscellaneous agriculture laws, the state fair association, county extension agents, the county fair association, agricultural experiment stations, and the agricultural products utilization commission; to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 57-15-06.7 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to counties levying taxes to fund extension agents; to authorize the legislative council to make certain statutory redesignations; to repeal chapters 4-01, 4-02, 4-02.1, 4-05.1, 4-08, 4-11.1, 4-13.2, 4-14, 4-14.1, 4-14.2, 4-19, 4-21.1, 4-21.2, 4-22, 4-23, 4-24, 4-30, 4-32, 4-33, 4-35, 4-35.1, 4-35.2, 4-36, 4-37, 4-40, 4-41, 4-43, and 19-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the agriculture commissioner, agricultural fair associations, the state fair association, agricultural experiment stations, county agents, potato production contracts, the poultry division, unfair discrimination in the purchase of farm products, the agriculturally derived fuel tax fund, the northern crops institute, forestry and tree distribution, nurseries and nursery stock, the trees for North Dakota program, soil conservation districts, agricultural conservation and adjustment, miscellaneous agriculture laws, dairy products regulations, the interstate pest control compact, plant pests, the pesticide act, chemigation regulation, pesticide and pesticide container disposal, the agricultural development act, agriculture in the classroom, crop production products, industrial hemp, meatpacking plant assistance, and eggs; to provide a penalty; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The agriculture commissioner, agricultural fair associations, the state fair association, agricultural experiment stations, county agents, potato production contracts, the poultry division, unfair discrimination in the purchase of farm products, the agriculturally derived fuel tax fund, the northern crops institute, forestry and tree distribution, nurseries and nursery stock, the trees for North Dakota program, soil conservation districts, agricultural conservation and adjustment, miscellaneous agriculture laws, dairy products regulations, the interstate pest control compact, plant pests, the pesticide act, chemigation regulation, pesticide and pesticide container disposal, the agricultural development act, agriculture in the classroom, crop production products, industrial hemp, meatpacking plant assistance, and eggs; to provide a penalty; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/05 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-28 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2017-03-27 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-03-03 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |