ND SB2021 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the information technology department; to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-59; to amend and reenact sections 54-59-15 and 54-59-22 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to acceptance of funds and to agencies exempted from certain services of the information technology department; to provide for studies; to provide for a report to the budget section; to provide an appropriation for the office of management and budget; and to provide for various transfers.
Title
Acceptance of funds and to agencies exempted from certain services of the information technology department; to provide for studies; to provide for a report to the budget section; to provide an appropriation for the office of management and budget; and to provide for various transfers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor 05/03 |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-05-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-05-02 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 76 nays 14 |
2013-05-02 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-18 | House | Appoint Rep. Streyle to replace Rep. Sanford on conference committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Conference committee appointed Thoreson Sanford Glassheim |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Wanzek G. Lee Robinson |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2013-04-10 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 80 nays 13 |
2013-04-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 4 1 |
2013-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-01-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |