ND 2020 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Conference committee appointed Monson Schmidt Boe
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota state university extension service, northern crops institute, upper great plains transportation institute, main research center, branch research centers, and agronomy seed farm; to provide for a report; and to provide an exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota state university extension service, northern crops institute, upper great plains transportation institute, main research center, branch research centers, and agronomy seed farm; to provide for a report; and to provide an exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HouseConference committee appointed Monson Schmidt Boe
2021-04-14SenateConference committee appointed Erbele Wanzek Heckaman
2021-04-14SenateRefused to concur
2021-04-13SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2021-04-13HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 81 nays 13
2021-04-12HouseLaid over one legislative day
2021-04-08HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-04-07HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 1 3
2021-03-23HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-03-12HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-03-09HouseCommittee Hearing 01:30
2021-03-09HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-03-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
2021-02-19HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-18SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-02-18SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-17SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2021-01-20SenateCommittee Hearing 03:30
2021-01-20SenateCommittee Hearing 02:45
2021-01-20SenateCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-01-20SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2021-01-20SenateCommittee Hearing 10:15
2021-01-05SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback