ND 2020 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota state university extension service, northern crops institute, upper great plains transportation institute, main research center, branch research centers, and agronomy seed farm; to amend and reenact sections 4-05.1-05 and 4-08-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to main research center experiment station and extension service position adjustments; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for budget section reports; to provide for a report to the appropriations committees; to provide an exemption; and to provide an expiration date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Main research center experiment station and extension service position adjustments; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for budget section reports; to provide for a report to the appropriations committees; to provide an exemption; and to provide an expiration date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26SenateSigned by Governor 04/26
2017-04-25SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-25SenateSigned by President
2017-04-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-24HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 58 nays 32
2017-04-24HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-24HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-24SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 3
2017-04-24SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-24SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-18SenateAppoint Sen. Erbele to replace Sen. Wanzek on conference committee
2017-04-13SenateAppoint Sen. Wanzek to replace Sen. Erbele on conference committee
2017-04-10HouseConference committee appointed Monson Schmidt Boe
2017-04-07SenateConference committee appointed Bowman Erbele Grabinger
2017-04-07SenateRefused to concur
2017-04-06SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-04-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 74 nays 16
2017-04-06HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-04-06HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 0 3
2017-03-24HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-03-21HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-03-07HouseCommittee Hearing 03:00
2017-03-07HouseCommittee Hearing 02:15
2017-03-07HouseCommittee Hearing 01:30
2017-03-07HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-03-07HouseCommittee Hearing 10:15
2017-03-07HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-14SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 2
2017-02-14SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-13SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2017-01-18SenateCommittee Hearing 03:00
2017-01-18SenateCommittee Hearing 02:15
2017-01-18SenateCommittee Hearing 01:30
2017-01-18SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-01-18SenateCommittee Hearing 10:15
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback