ND SB2020 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by Governor 05/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by Governor 05/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state water commission; to provide exemptions; to create and enact three new sections to chapter 61-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a Bank of North Dakota line of credit, to the state water commission cost-share policy, and to North Dakota outdoor heritage fund grants and cost-share; to amend and reenact section 54-35-02.7 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the water topics overview committee; to provide legislative intent; to designate funding; to provide contingent allocations; to provide for a report to the legislative assembly; to provide for legislative management reports; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for a state water commission study; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The water topics overview committee; to provide legislative intent; to designate funding; to provide contingent allocations; to provide for a report to the legislative assembly; to provide for legislative management reports; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for a state water commission study; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor 05/12 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-28 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-28 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2015-04-28 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2, Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-17 | House | Conference committee appointed Schmidt Streyle Boe |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee appointed G. Lee Holmberg Robinson |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2015-04-15 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-15 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 3 |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 1 1 |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 1 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |