ND SB2019 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by Governor 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by Governor 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the parks and recreation department; to provide a 2013-15 appropriation; to provide a grant to the International Peace Garden; to provide funding for the Lewis and Clark interpretive center; to provide an exemption; and to declare an emergency.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the parks and recreation department; to provide a 2013-15 appropriation; to provide a grant to the International Peace Garden; to provide funding for the Lewis and Clark interpretive center; to provide an exemption; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/29 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-27 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-27 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 67 nays 22 |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 5, Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-17 | House | Conference committee appointed Streyle Dosch Guggisberg |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Krebsbach Sorvaag O'Connell |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2015-04-15 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-15 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 79 nays 13 |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 2 1 |
2015-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 1 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |