ND SB2018 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state historical society; and to provide for a report to the legislative assembly.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state historical society; and to provide for a report to the legislative assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 63 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 63 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/24 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-19 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2019-04-11 | House | Conference committee appointed Schatz Nathe Boe |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Erbele Krebsbach Mathern |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-04-05 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 63 nays 21 |
2019-04-05 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 3 3 |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |