ND SB2017 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the game and fish department; and to amend and reenact section 20.1-02-16.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the game and fish fund.
Title
The game and fish fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/26 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-22 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-19 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2019-04-16 | House | Conference committee appointed Howe Brandenburg Mock |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Oehlke Wanzek Grabinger |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-04-11 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 85 nays 8 |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 3 4 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |