ND SB2015 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Signed by Governor 04/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Signed by Governor 04/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of corrections and rehabilitation; to provide for a report; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide an exemption; and to declare an emergency.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of corrections and rehabilitation; to provide for a report; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide an exemption; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/27 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-22 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-22 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 86 nays 6 |
2021-04-22 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Conference committee appointed Schobinger B. Anderson Mitskog |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Wanzek Poolman Mathern |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-04-12 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-12 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 75 nays 17 |
2021-04-08 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 0 3 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-02-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |