ND 2014 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the industrial commission and the agencies under the management of the industrial commission; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide a contingent appropriation; to provide for transfers; to amend and reenact sections 15-62.1-07, 28-25-11, 54-17-40, 54-18-19, and 57-62-02 of the North Dakota Century Code and section? 26 of chapter 14 of the 2015? Session Laws, relating to loan guarantee fees, suspension of recreational licenses, the housing incentive fund, North Dakota mill and elevator profits, coal development trust fund allocations, and a financial center project; to repeal section 54-17-41 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to housing incentive fund reports; to provide statements of legislative intent; to provide for reports; to provide exemptions; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing incentive fund reports; to provide statements of legislative intent; to provide for reports; to provide exemptions; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateSigned by Governor 05/01
2017-04-27SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-26SenateSigned by President
2017-04-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-26HouseEmergency clause carried
2017-04-26HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 66 nays 24
2017-04-26HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-26HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-26SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2017-04-26SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-25SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-07HouseConference committee appointed Brandenburg Kempenich Delmore
2017-04-06SenateConference committee appointed Sorvaag Hogue Mathern
2017-04-06SenateRefused to concur
2017-04-05SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-04-05HouseEmergency clause carried
2017-04-05HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 68 nays 22
2017-04-04HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-04-04HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 4 1
2017-03-15HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-03-09HouseCommittee Hearing 03:15
2017-03-09HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-03-01HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-17SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-02-17SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-16SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-01-19SenateCommittee Hearing 01:30
2017-01-19SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback