ND SB2014 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state industrial commission and the agencies under the management of the industrial commission; to create and enact two new sections to chapter 54-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to mill and elevator profits and gain sharing; to amend and reenact section 54-17.5-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to education activities relating to the lignite industry; to repeal section 16 of chapter 14 of the 2007 Session Laws, relating to a transfer from the North Dakota mill and elevator association; to provide legislative intent; to provide an appropriation; to provide a contingent appropriation; to provide an exemption; to authorize transfers; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state industrial commission and the agencies under the management of the industrial commission; to create and enact two new sections to chapter 54-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to mill and elevator profits and gain sharing; to amend and reenact section 54-17.5-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to education activities relating to the lignite industry; to repeal section 16 of chapter 14 of the 2007 Session Laws, relating to a transfer from the North Dakota mill and elevator association; to provide legislative intent; to provide an appropriation; to provide a contingent appropriation; to provide an exemption; to authorize transfers; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-02 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-05-01 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-05-01 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-05-01 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-05-01 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-05-01 | Second reading passed, y 047 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-05-01 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-05-01 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-17 | Conf comm appointed Thoreson Berg Kaldor | |
2009-04-16 | Conf comm appointed Wardner Christmann Krauter | |
2009-04-16 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-15 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-14 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-14 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 086 nays 006 | |
2009-04-13 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-10 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 024 n 001 | |
2009-03-02 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Committee Hearing 11:15 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations | |
2009-02-19 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-02-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-19 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 014 n 000 | |
2009-01-15 | Committee Hearing 03:00 | |
2009-01-15 | Committee Hearing 01:30 | |
2009-01-15 | Committee Hearing 10:45 | |
2009-01-15 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-01-13 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-01-13 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-01-13 | Amended on floor | |
2009-01-13 | Request return from committee | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2014.html |