ND 2013 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the commissioner of university and school lands; to provide an appropriation to the state treasurer; to provide for transfers; to provide for distributions from permanent funds; to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-51 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the energy impact fund; to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 57-51-01 and sections 57-51-15 and 57-51.1-07.6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to oil and gas gross production tax definitions and allocations and the political subdivision allocation fund; to repeal section 57-51.1-07.6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the political subdivision allocation fund; to provide exemptions; to provide for reports; to provide statements of legislative intent; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The political subdivision allocation fund; to provide exemptions; to provide for reports; to provide statements of legislative intent; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 61 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 61 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-26SenateSigned by President
2017-04-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-26HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 58 nays 32
2017-04-26HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-26HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-26SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 5
2017-04-26SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-25SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-14HouseConference committee appointed Kempenich Brandenburg Delzer
2017-04-12SenateAppoint Sen. Wardner to replace Sen. Dever on conference committee
2017-04-12SenateConference committee appointed Dever Wanzek Grabinger
2017-04-12SenateRefused to concur
2017-04-10SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-04-10HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 61 nays 31
2017-04-10HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-04-10HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 2 2
2017-03-17HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-17SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-02-17SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-16SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-01-20SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback