ND SB2012 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of human services; to create and enact two new sections to chapter 50-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to peer support specialist certification and the establishment of a community behavioral health program; to amend and reenact subsection 9 of section 50-06.4-10 and sections 50-24.1-31, 50-24.1-37, and 54-27-25 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the brain injury advisory council, optional medical assistance for children, the Medicaid expansion program, and tobacco settlement trust fund allocations; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for transfers; to provide for a legislative management report; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide an exemption; to provide an effective date; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The brain injury advisory council, optional medical assistance for children, the Medicaid expansion program, and tobacco settlement trust fund allocations; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for transfers; to provide for a legislative management report; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide an exemption; to provide an effective date; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor 05/01 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-26 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-26 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 75 nays 16 |
2019-04-26 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1, Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-17 | House | Conference committee appointed J. Nelson Kreidt Holman |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Dever Erbele Mathern |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-04-15 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-15 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 71 nays 19 |
2019-04-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 2 0 |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 11:30 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 08:45 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2019-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2019-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1, Emergency clause carried |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |