ND SB2012 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of human services; to provide an exemption; to provide legislative intent; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of human services; to provide an exemption; to provide legislative intent; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor 05/09 | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-22 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-21 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2011-04-20 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Conference committee appointed Pollert Bellew Kaldor | |
2011-04-07 | Refused to concur | |
2011-04-06 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2011-04-06 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-05 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 3 1 | |
2011-03-21 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2011-03-17 | Committee Hearing 02:15 | |
2011-03-16 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-03-15 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-03-14 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-03-11 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-03-10 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-03-09 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-03-08 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-03-07 | Committee Hearing 02:15 | |
2011-03-04 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-03-03 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-23 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-22 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 0 | |
2011-01-19 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-01-18 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-01-17 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |