ND SB2011 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the highway patrol; to provide a report; to repeal subdivision b of subsection 5 of section 39-08-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to accident report forms; to provide for a transfer; to provide an exemption; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Accident report forms; to provide for a transfer; to provide an exemption; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/30 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-29 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-29 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 84 nays 4 |
2021-04-29 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Conference committee appointed Howe Mock Meier |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Krebsbach Davison Heckaman |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-04-13 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-13 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 4 |
2021-04-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-12 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 2 0 |
2021-03-17 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-03-09 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |