ND SB2011 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the highway patrol.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the highway patrol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor 05/06 |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-05-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-05-03 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 85 nays 7 |
2013-05-03 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-03 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-16 | House | Conference committee appointed Kempenich Brandenburg Guggisberg |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Krebsbach Wanzek O'Connell |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2013-04-10 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 85 nays 8 |
2013-04-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 0 2 |
2013-03-21 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-15 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |