ND SB2010 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Signed by Governor 04/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Signed by Governor 04/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the insurance commissioner; to provide an appropriation for the distribution of funds from the insurance tax distribution fund; and to amend and reenact sections 26.1-01-09, 26.1-26.6-01, 26.1-26.6-04, 26.1-26.6-05, and subsection 4 of section 26.1-44-03.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the commissioner's salary, bail bond agents, and surplus lines insurance filings.
Title
The commissioner's salary, bail bond agents, and surplus lines insurance filings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/27 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-23 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 86 nays 2 |
2015-04-23 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-23 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-20 | House | Conference committee appointed Thoreson Vigesaa Hogan |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Krebsbach Erbele Mathern |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2015-04-13 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 2 |
2015-04-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 2 0 |
2015-03-20 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-03-09 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |