ND SB2009 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the agriculture commissioner; to amend and reenact sections 4-01-21 and 4-01-23, subsection 2 of section 5-01-17, subsection 2 of section 5-01-19, and sections 19-20.1-03, 19-20.1-03.1, and 19-20.1-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the salary of the agriculture commissioner, the promotion of sustainably grown commodities, domestic wineries and domestic distilleries, and fertilizer distribution registration, licensing, and inspection fees; to provide for a transfer; to provide an exemption; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The salary of the agriculture commissioner, the promotion of sustainably grown commodities, domestic wineries and domestic distilleries, and fertilizer distribution registration, licensing, and inspection fees; to provide for a transfer; to provide an exemption; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/05 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor 05/05 | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-21 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-20 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2011-04-19 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-08 | Conference committee appointed Monson Skarphol Williams | |
2011-04-05 | Refused to concur | |
2011-04-04 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2011-04-04 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 64 nays 28 | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-30 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 0 0 | |
2011-03-07 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-23 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-22 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-01-13 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |