ND SB2008 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of financial institutions.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of financial institutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-30 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-04-30 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-30 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-30 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-04-30 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-29 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-17 | Conf comm appointed Dosch Berg Glassheim | |
2009-04-16 | Conf comm appointed Krebsbach Bowman Seymour | |
2009-04-16 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-10 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-10 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 091 nays 000 | |
2009-04-07 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 024 n 000 | |
2009-03-02 | Committee Hearing 03:00 | |
2009-02-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations | |
2009-02-13 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-12 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-02-10 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 011 n 000 | |
2009-01-19 | Committee Hearing 03:45 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2008.html |