ND SB2007 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the veterans' home and department of veterans' affairs; to provide for contingent funding; to provide an exception to the moratorium on expansion of basic care bed capacity; to provide legislative intent; and to provide for a report to the budget section.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the veterans' home and department of veterans' affairs; to provide for contingent funding; to provide an exception to the moratorium on expansion of basic care bed capacity; to provide legislative intent; and to provide for a report to the budget section.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-30 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 085 nays 005 | |
2009-04-30 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-30 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-29 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-04-29 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-16 | Appointed Wardner to replace Bowman | |
2009-04-15 | Conf comm appointed Kreidt Nelson Metcalf | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Kilzer Bowman Mathern | |
2009-04-14 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-09 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-09 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-09 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 087 nays 006 | |
2009-04-03 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 018 n 003 | |
2009-03-16 | Committee Hearing 02:45 | |
2009-03-16 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations | |
2009-02-19 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-18 | Motion to reconsider laid on table | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-02-18 | Amendment failed | |
2009-02-18 | Amended on floor | |
2009-02-18 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 014 n 000 | |
2009-01-08 | Committee Hearing 09:45 | |
2009-01-08 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2007.html |