ND SB2006 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota aeronautics commission.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota aeronautics commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 85 nays 6 |
2017-04-04 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 3 3 |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2017-03-03 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |